Trustees HOME START NORTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1116665
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julia Halliwell Chair 24 March 2022
None on record
Robin Draper Trustee 20 February 2025
None on record
Carole Dehghani Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Fiona Seymour Trustee 30 January 2024
None on record
Wayne Lawrence Trustee 08 January 2024
None on record
Peter Greenham Trustee 08 January 2024
None on record
Samantha Armsby Trustee 08 January 2024
None on record