Financial history SHOW RACISM THE RED CARD

Charity number: 1116971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £988.16k £2.01m £1.44m £1.32m £1.33m
Total expenditure £962.69k £928.56k £1.23m £1.68m £1.67m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £478.43k £419.76k £347.05k £664.52k £199.06k
Income - Donations and legacies £85.67k £1.22m £482.06k £308.96k £179.40k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £900.78k £798.11k £959.57k £1.01m £1.13m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £611 £206 £128 £2.14k £5.82k
Income - Other £1.09k £1.27k £1.26k £450 £10.51k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £179.40k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £962.40k £928.56k £699.14k £1.68m £1.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £288 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.40k £8.07k £9.26k £0 £10.74k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £530.47k £0 £0