THE HEALTHY LIVING ALLIANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Healthy Living Alliance (HLA) aims to give everyone an equal chance to improve their health and well-being. It is the only national organisation focusing specifically on healthy living in its broadest sense and on measures to prevent ill-health. Launched in 2005, the HLA now represents a wide range of healthy living initiatives throughout England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 February 2007: Standard registration
- 05 January 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.54k | £16.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.46k | £50.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 24 May 2010 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 21 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 01 June 2009 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 19 May 2009 | 108 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 AUGUST 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 JANUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGHOUT ENGLAND; 2) TO PROMOTE HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 3) TO SUPPORT THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window