Accounts and annual returns THE SCHOOLS COMPETITION ACT SETTLEMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1118689
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 20 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 23 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 08 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 23 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required