Accounts and annual returns WORLD ENDOMETRIOSIS RESEARCH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1116775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 01 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 16 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 22 June 2023 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 22 June 2023 22 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 October 2022 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 31 October 2022 153 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 October 2022 518 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 31 October 2022 518 days late Download Open in new window