Financial history FELLOWSHIP EDUCATIONAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1118431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £89.37k £142.05k £76.60k £126.87k £114.82k
Total expenditure £110.94k £79.24k £114.98k £144.00k £99.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.47k £87.88k £18.69k £50.40k £2.44k