NEW FUTURE NOW LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO DEVELOP SKILLS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED IN SOUTHWARK AND ELSEWHERE. SO THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. TO EDUCATE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY BY PROVIDING INTEGRATED EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES IN A HOLISTIC WAY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 March 2007: Standard registration
- NFN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAILA THERESE RAVINDRANATH | Chair | 12 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
Heloise Kirtana Ravindranath | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £825 | £1.61k | £382 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £825 | £1.61k | £382 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2022 | 285 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY OF SOUTHWARK AND ELSEWHERE, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
SOUTHWARK AND ELSWEHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4C GROSVENOR PARK
LONDON
SE5 0NQ
- Phone:
- 07506 934 094
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window