Sheldon Student Opportunity Fund

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT SHELDON SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EXPERIENCES TO ENRICH THE EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 08 November 2006: Standard registration
- SHELDON SCHOOL ENRICHMENT FUND (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Kew-Dowd | Chair | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Harper | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Warne | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Deery | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Dew | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Pullin | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Symes | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lynch | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann-Marie Neil | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Dare | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £4.91k | £8.26k | £20.62k | £5.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.41k | £3.56k | £4.63k | £13.69k | £12.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 SEP 2006 as amended on 30 Nov 2023 as amended on 30 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT SHELDON SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AN EXPERIENCES TO ENRICH THE EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
SHELDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sheldon School
Hardenhuish Lane
CHIPPENHAM
SN14 6HJ
- Phone:
- 01249 766020
- Email:
- Asymes@sheldonschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window