FRIENDS OF ALDINGHAM CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist the Parochial Church Council of St. Cuthberts Church, Aldingham in their work of maintaining and promoting the Church buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 June 2022
Total income includes £4,275 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 07 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT ERNEST WHEATLEY | Chair |
|
||||||
JOHN ROGER BOWES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM SHEPERD TOWERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/06/2018 | 04/06/2019 | 04/06/2020 | 04/06/2021 | 04/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.37k | £4.89k | £590 | £1.35k | £10.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £444 | £610 | £551 | £3.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days | |
Annual return | 04 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 415 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 415 days | |
Annual return | 04 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 June 2021 | 31 May 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 June 2020 | 06 October 2021 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 4 JANUARY 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF ALDINGHAM CHURCH AND BY PROVIDING ADDITIONAL FACILITIES AND CONTRIBUTING TOWARDS THE COST OF MAINTAINING THE MINISTRY AT THE CHURCH AND THE DAY TO DAY COSTS INCIDENTAL THERETO FOR AND ON BEHALF OF THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST CUTHBERT'S CHURCH, ALDINGHAM.
Area of benefit
ST CUTHBERT'S CHURCH ALDINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
MYRTLE COTTAGE
MAIN STREET
BAYCLIFF
ULVERSTON
LA12 9RN
- Phone:
- 01229869315
- Email:
- gehop@madasafish.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window