BOWEL DISEASE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charities objective is to finance areas of academic medical research to improve treatments and outcomes for patients with bowel cancer, Colitis and Crohn's disease through research programmes. Our research is based at St Georges hospital in Tooting, south west London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 December 2006: Standard registration
- COLORECTAL RESEARCH FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Grant McKay | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
GARY DOUCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR DEVINDER KUMAR PHD FRCS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.79k | £2.94k | £91.60k | £7.58k | £8.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.27k | £7.75k | £2.00k | £10.05k | £6.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13/10/2006 AS AMENDED ON 18/11/2006 AS AMENDED ON 21/11/2011
Charitable objects
3. APPLICATION OF INCOME. THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") (A) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO CROHN'S DISEASE, ULCERATIVE COLITIS, ANY OTHER INFLAMMATORY BOWEL OR FUNCTIONAL COLORECTAL DISEASE OR CONDITION INCLUDING IRRITABLE BOWEL SYNDROME AND FAECAL INCONTINENCE, AND BOWEL CANCER (TOGETHER "BOWEL DISEASES"), AND BY PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; (B) RELIEVING NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM BOWEL DISEASES BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND HELP FOR PATIENTS IN THE MANAGEMENT OF THEIR DISEASE; AND (C) FUNDING, ASSISTING, OR CONTRIBUTING TO, ACADEMIC AND/OR MEDICAL RESEARCH AND OTHER PROJECTS AIMED AT DISCOVERING OR IMPROVING MEDICAL KNOWLEDGE OF THE CAUSES OF BOWEL DISEASES AND AIMED AT FINDING OR DEVELOPING CURES OR TREATMENTS FOR BOWEL DISEASES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 WESTWAY
RAYNES PARK
LONDON
SW20 9LU
- Phone:
- 02084090886
- Email:
- info@boweldisease.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window