WHIXLEY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY CRICKET CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of facilities for participation in healthy sporting and recreational activities for the whole community, especially young people 7-17 years, throughout Nidderdale, and N Yorkshire; along with encouraging wider development of individual and team skills, and the promotion of training, coaching, education, welfare, social cohesion, fitness, healthy living and community well-being. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 17 September 2007: Standard registration
- WHIXLEY CRICKET CLUB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jordan Webster | Chair | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Witham Captain | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harvey Green Secretary | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Lumb | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Harvey Treasurer | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Greenwood TrustChair | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
IAIN PETER RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES JOSEPH BAINES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEWART WITHAM Groundsman | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.14k | £13.58k | £25.31k | £8.73k | £16.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.25k | £5.30k | £15.75k | £8.63k | £14.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 20 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF CRICKET WITHIN WHIXLEY AND DISTRICT
Area of benefit
WHIXLEY AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Fairfields Drive
Skelton
YORK
YO30 1YP
- Phone:
- 01904470035
- Email:
- patcalg@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window