WORLD PEACE GARDEN CAMDEN LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- developing a derelict open space into a Peace Garden - Creating a 41 m long Peace Wall where the public can inscribe what they will do to create peace in the world. The wall and tiles can be viewed online via a dedicated website - Fundraising - Developing and supporting Peace Diplomats who will engage their communities by developing similar gardens - providing a commumity goodwill centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Camden
Governance
- 26 July 2007: Standard registration
- MJET LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr CHHAGANBHAI DAHYABHAI MISTRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.72k | £571 | £1.53k | £1.09k | £1.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £683 | £4.18k | £1.52k | £1.66k | £747 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 MAY 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE PROTECT AND CONSERVE THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND AMENITIES OF THE COMMUNITY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN AND AROUND THE AREA OF SOUTH END GREEN, HAMPSTEAD, LONDON.
Area of benefit
SOUTH END GREEN, HAMPSTEAD, LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6
Southhill Park
London
London
NW3 2SB
- Phone:
- 02077947794
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window