Financial history THE MCCANN CHARITY

Charity number: 1116681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.07k £2.62k £2.42k £35.00k £143.00k
Total expenditure £12.60k £16.77k £22.40k £27.59k £31.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A