ACTION FOR CARERS (SURREY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide information, advice and support for carers all across Surrey. Including benefits advice, advocacy, guidance on moving and handling, support groups, free resources and more. We also help carers have their say on carer matters in Surrey, and nationally. We have specialist support available for young carers, young adult carers (18-24), and people connected to the Armed Forces
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,454,444
Donations and legacies | £251.54k | |
Charitable activities | £2.19m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £17.02k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,297,284
Raising funds | £14.87k | |
Charitable activities | £2.28m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,185,882 from 4 government contract(s) and £116,000 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £14.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.28m | |
Retained for future use | £157.16k |
People

62 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 November 2006: Standard registration
- 18 January 2023: Funds received from 1061488 CARERS SUPPORT SPELTHORNE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mirjana Fowle | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Bovell | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Fitzgerald | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Young | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abimbade Olubanke Ewetade | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Philip Lawrence Brown | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sarah Maskery | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Patricia Yard | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hollie Margaret Jessica Baker | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rhianna Patricia Williams | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET HICKS | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.75m | £2.77m | £2.86m | £2.19m | £2.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.92m | £2.74m | £3.03m | £2.18m | £2.30m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.55m | £2.55m | £2.63m | £1.99m | £2.19m | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.50k | £70.40k | £31.40k | £88.14k | £116.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £140.98k | £142.65k | £194.09k | £146.37k | £251.54k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.61m | £2.63m | £2.66m | £2.00m | £2.19m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.55k | £3.91k | £1.09k | £4.68k | £17.02k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £38.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.89m | £2.71m | £3.00m | £2.15m | £2.28m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £30.25k | £29.22k | £35.76k | £27.36k | £14.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £34.56k | £22.08k | £24.34k | £27.47k | £29.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.78k | £2.99k | £7.26k | £5.55k | £3.84k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £885.78k | £928.32k | £894.45k | £740.68k | £937.15k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £114.52k | £125.88k | £272.90k | £100.47k | £138.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 JAN 2019 as amended on 06 Dec 2019 as amended on 27 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE “OBJECTS”) ARE:- 1.1 TO PROVIDE RELIEF OF THE NEEDS OF CARERS (AS DEFINED IN 1.8 BELOW); 1.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TO CARERS; 1.3 TO ENCOURAGE AND PROVIDE SERVICES FOR THOSE REQUIRING CARE WHICH TAKE ACCOUNT OF THE NEEDS OF CARERS; 1.4 TO RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE COUNTY OF SURREY, OF CARERS’ NEEDS, CONCERNS AND VALUE; 1.5 TO COMMUNICATE BETWEEN CARERS, POLICY MAKERS AND OTHER SERVICES SUPPORTING CARERS, ENABLING CARERS TO HAVE AN EFFECTIVE VOICE AND AN INFORMED REPRESENTATION IN POLICY-MAKING AND SERVICE DEVELOPMENT; 1.6 TO ENCOURAGE THE EXCHANGE BY CARERS, POLICY MAKERS AND OTHER SERVICES OF USEFUL INFORMATION AND BEST PRACTICE IN CARERS’ ISSUES AND PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE SERVICES TO SUPPORT CARERS PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN SURREY; AND 1.7 TO PURSUE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES. 1.8 A “CARER” IS: 1.8.1 SOMEONE WHO PROVIDES REGULAR UNPAID HELP TO A PERSON (OR PERSONS) WHO IS DISABLED, ILL OR INFIRM, OR WHO IS OTHERWISE IN NEED OF CARE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE COUNTY OF SURREY; 1.8.2 PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY SOMEONE WHO LIVES IN THE COUNTY OF SURREY AND PROVIDES REGULAR UNPAID HELP TO A PERSON (OR PERSONS) WHO IS DISABLED, ILL OR INFIRM, OR WHO IS OTHERWISE IN NEED OF CARE, OUTSIDE THE COUNTY OF SURREY; OR 1.8.3 SOMEONE WHO, WITHIN THE LAST FIVE YEARS, HAS FALLEN WITHIN THE DESCRIPTION IN 1.8.1 OR 1.8.2. THE TERM “CARER” ALSO INCLUDES PEOPLE WHO FALL INTO ANY OF THE ABOVE CATEGORIES AND ARE UNDER THE AGE OF EIGHTEEN OR ARE PARENTS CARING FOR THEIR OWN CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASTOLAT
CONIERS WAY
BURPHAM
GUILDFORD
SURREY
GU4 7HL
- Phone:
- 03030401234
- Email:
- Info@actionforcarers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window