FOUNTAIN OF PEACE CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relieve poverty and advance education for children, adults and the community at large in the United Kingdom and around the world. Provide care, relief, protection, housing, medical and educational facilities for people impoverished, disadvantaged or marginalised by reason of their economic or geographical circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Uganda
Governance
- FOUNTAIN OF PEACE CHILDRENS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- FOUNTAIN OF PEACE CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Dodd | Chair | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Euen Lockie | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Cross | Trustee | 22 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah McIntyre | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Neil Vincent Cooper | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Williams | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|||||
ANNE BASABE | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN SHEPHERD | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Shepherd | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.87k | £103.14k | £118.38k | £112.11k | £187.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.68k | £107.65k | £119.95k | £76.59k | £156.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 SEPTEMBER. as amended on 25 Aug 2020 as amended on 08 Mar 2021 as amended on 25 Feb 2021 as amended on 25 Feb 2021 as amended on 27 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
4.1 The Objects of the Charity are: 4.1.1. to advance the Christian Faith; 4.1.2. the relief of poverty and sickness and the distress caused thereby among children in Africa and such parts of the world as the Trustees may from time to time think fit including, but not by way of limitation, through the provision of orphanages and homes for abandoned children and such other charitable activities as the Trustees shall determine from time to time; 4.1.3. to advance education for the benefit of children disadvantaged or marginalised by reason of their economic or geographical circumstances in such parts of the world as the Trustees may from time to time think fit, including, but not by way of limitation, the provision of sponsorship programmes; and 4.1.4. the provision of facilities for the benefit of such local communities in Africa and the world which facilities may without limitation include the provision of child care services and meetings, lectures and classes and other forms of education, recreation and leisure time occupation, without distinction of race, sex, political, religious or other opinion and with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants as the Trustees may from time to time in their discretion determine. 4.2 This Article 4 may be amended by special resolution, but only with the prior written consent of the Charity Commission. 4.3 The Statement of Faith may be amended or supplemented by a resolution of the Trustees passed by a majority of at least 75% of them, provided that any such amendments or supplemental statements shall be consistent with the Statement of Faith as at the date of adoption of these Articles.
Area of benefit
IN AFRICA AND SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Widmore Cottages
Asheridge
Chesham
HP5 2UY
- Phone:
- 01494758998
- Email:
- info@fountainofpeace.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window