Accounts and annual returns THE NATIONAL BULLYING HELPLINE LTD

Charity number: 1117852
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2009 18 October 2010 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2008 27 April 2010 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required