Financial history THE TRIUMPHANT CHURCH OF GOD

Charity number: 1121492
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £74.89k £44.17k £64.00k £63.60k £78.34k
Total expenditure £70.02k £39.85k £36.59k £61.01k £45.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A