Financial history EMBERCOMBE

Charity Number: 1116793
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £203.25k £447.09k £245.69k £322.49k £517.65k
Total expenditure £356.74k £395.44k £459.85k £332.37k £478.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £115.09k £11.29k £7.25k £3.67k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £151.39k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £365.38k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £873
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £473.41k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £800
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.91k