TRANSPLANT SUPPORT NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TSN is a nationwide network that supports patients, family and carers of all solid organ transplants and mechanical implants. It provides access to someone who has undergone the same transplantation process as them; before, during and after a transplant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 November 2006: Standard registration
- 28 July 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 July 2019: Funds received from 1052328 TRANSPLANT SUPPORT NETWORK
- 28 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1060656 HAREFIELD TRANSPLANT CLUB (THE HAMSTERS)
- 28 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1049067 WYTHENSHAWE HOSPITAL TRANSPLANT FUND
- TRANSPORT SUPPORT NETWORK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.97k | £0 | £0 | £206 | £76 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.91k | £0 | £204 | £120 | £2.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 30 June 2019 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 12 September 2018 | 224 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 12 September 2018 | 589 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MAY 2006.
Charitable objects
(3.) THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE:- (3.1) TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO HAVE HAD OR ARE HOPING TO HAVE A SOLID ORGAN OR TISSUE TRANSPLANT OR MECHANICAL IMPLANT AND THEIR FAMILY AND CARERS AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE FOREGOING BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND ADVICE. (3.2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE SUBJECT OF ORGAN TRANSPLANTATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window