HOPE FOR HUMANITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
November 2007 -ú1000 grant given to MDAUK (reg no: 1114559) for hospital construction in Kashmir
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 09 January 2007: Standard registration
- 09 January 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 15 August 2009 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2007 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 NOVEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE: TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE HEALTH IN AREAS OF THE DEVELOPING WORLD THAT ARE IN NEED BY: A. PROVIDING BASIC PROVISIONS REQUIRED FOR DAILY LIVING, SUCH AS FOOD, WATER, SANITATION, SHELTER AND CLOTHING B. ESTABLISH PUBLIC HEALTH PROGRAMS SUCH AS IMMUNISATION AND ANTENATAL CARE C. PROVIDING FUNDS TO HELP MAINTAIN OR BUILD PUBLIC INSTITUTIONS SUCH AS ORPHANAGES, SCHOOLS AND HOSPITALS.
Area of benefit
AREAS OF THE DEVELOPING WORLD THAT ARE IN NEED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window