THE SATURN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE FOUNDATION PROVIDES GRANTS FOR PROJECTS TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF SUCH PERSONS. DURING THE YEAR TO 31 MARCH 2015 THE FOUNDATION MADE GRANTS TO SECOND SIGHT IN THE UK,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Harrow
- Islington
Governance
- 16 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BHARAT RATILAL VELJI SHAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PARESH KUMAR VELJI LAKHAMSHI SHAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR RAMESH MANILAL SHAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.80k | £915 | £151 | £1.10k | £5.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.69k | £137.34k | £166.88k | £115.21k | £112.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 March 2022 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHERESOEVER SITUATE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF LOCAL NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER OR BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING ) OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
173 CLEVELAND STREET
LONDON
W1T 6QR
- Phone:
- 02073800080
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window