Financial history CRICKLADE OPEN DOOR

Charity number: 1124700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £78.65k £28.99k £33.73k £46.97k £48.28k
Total expenditure £18.78k £18.05k £37.51k £35.17k £39.66k
Income from government contracts £8.98k £8.98k £4.49k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.43k £5.90k £500 £9.00k £5.00k