WHITMORE BAY SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Whitmore Bay Surf Life Saving Club was established in 2003 and is based at the main beach on Barry Island,Barry,Vale of Glamorgan,Wales.Whitmore Bay SLSC is a voluntary,not-for-profit organisation,committed to providing a safe beach and aquatic environment to the community of Barry Island,whilst developing life saving skills and fitness of its members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 29 November 2006: Standard registration
- WHITMORE BAY SLSC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr CLIFF NELSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Chris Hadfield | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EMMA JANE ANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.75k | £10.21k | £12.78k | £24.04k | £23.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.66k | £6.87k | £5.71k | £28.29k | £21.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £200 | N/A | £5.22k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO SAVE LIFE, WHETHER BY PREVENTION OR BY RESCUE FROM THE BEACH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, VALE OF GLAMORGAN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Llys Y Coed
BARRY
South Glamorgan
CF62 6LU
- Phone:
- 07989687877
- Email:
- whitmoreslsc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window