THE RHONDDA POWERHOUSE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to preserve for the benefit of the people of the Rhondda and of the nation, the historical, architectural and constructional heritage that may exist in and around Rhondda in buildings of particular beauty or historical, architectural or constructional interest, in particular the building known as the Powerhouse at Llwynypia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 29 March 2007: Standard registration
- 30 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25 | £39 | £8 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £940 | £1.07k | £300 | £0 | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | 19 September 2018 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 01 January 2018 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 OCTOBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE RHONDDA AND OF THE NATION, THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND RHONDDA IN BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY STRUCTURE OR ERECTION, AND ANY PART OF A BUILDING AS SO DEFINED) OF ANY PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST, IN PARTICULAR THE BUILDING KNOWN AS THE POWERHOUSE AT LLWYNYPIA.
Area of benefit
RHONDDA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window