MARKET BOSWORTH RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
pONY rIDING FOR DISABLED CHILDREN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 06 March 2007: Standard registration
- 26 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 26 January 2015: Funds transferred to 1153299 ARDEN RDA GROUP
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.17k | £1.41k | £677 | £861 | £1.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.37k | £800 | £465 | £500 | £870 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 12 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 01 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 22 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING (COMPANY NO 5010395) A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ('THE COMPANY') BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING IN THE HINCKLEY AND MARKET BOSWORTH AREA.
Area of benefit
HINCKLEY AND MARKET BOSWORTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window