STAPELY JEWISH CARE HOME LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RESIDENTIAL AND NURSING CARE OF THE ELDERLY JEWISH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£2,193,564
Donations and legacies | £407.06k | |
Charitable activities | £1.79m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,133,335
Raising funds | £36.77k | |
Charitable activities | £2.10m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £36.77k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.10m | |
Retained for future use | £60.23k |
People

55 Employee(s)
2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 27 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP ETTINGER | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBERT JOEL ETTINGER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.73m | £2.84m | £2.28m | £2.13m | £2.19m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.45m | £2.60m | £2.06m | £1.96m | £2.13m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £387.91k | £248.52k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £494.79k | £496.34k | £512.78k | £237.49k | £407.06k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.23m | £2.34m | £1.77m | £1.65m | £1.79m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £248.52k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £435.00k | £375.00k | £53.69k | £195.00k | £398.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.45m | £2.59m | £2.04m | £1.91m | £2.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.78k | £749 | £11.71k | £45.77k | £36.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.77k | £89.55k | £76.30k | £0 | £50.83k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £8.22k | £731 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £489.78k | £463.27k | £403.26k | £340.56k | £286.58k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.37m | £1.50m | £2.19m | £2.38m | £2.54m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £575.22k | £437.31k | £842.37k | £795.77k | £842.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 25 February 2020 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 25 February 2020 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 OCTOBER 2006. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL HEALTH OR DISABILITY BY PROVIDING RESIDENTIAL, NURSING, SOCIAL OR WELFARE SERVICES OR FACILITIES INTENDED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS. SUCH SERVICES AND FACILITIES SHALL BE PROVIDED IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH THE GENERALLY RECOGNISED PRINCIPLES AND REQUIREMENTS OF THE JEWISH FAITH; (2) THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES HAVING OBJECTS SIMILAR TO AND CONSISTENT WITH THOSE IN SUB-CLAUSE (1) OF THIS ARTICLE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
STAPELEY RESIDENTIAL & NURSING HOME
NORTH MOSSLEY HILL ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L18 8BR
- Phone:
- 07764654180
- Email:
- accounts@stapelycare.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window