Financial history RAINBOWS PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1120323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.08k £21.57k £31.82k £40.36k £49.86k
Total expenditure £26.34k £22.22k £29.46k £42.94k £50.88k
Income from government contracts £18.59k N/A £19.92k £30.59k £38.52k
Income from government grants N/A £14.79k N/A N/A N/A