Accounts and annual returns NOTTINGHAM CHILDREN YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES PROJECT LTD

Charity number: 1118893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 06 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 11 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 25 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 25 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 13 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 13 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required