Financial history NOTTINGHAM CHILDREN YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES PROJECT LTD

Charity number: 1118893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £10.41k £26.80k £74.68k £106.21k £86.99k
Total expenditure £4.33k £19.81k £80.81k £81.48k £98.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A