SMARDEN GOOD NEIGHBOURS SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing services to local residents in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 01 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT JAMES BARNES | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Catherine Johnson | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Elaine Barton | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Selina Rose Bunting | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOCELYN PATRICIA CRAIG | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANET GRIFFITHS CAMERON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.77k | £340 | £1.32k | £558 | £385 | |
|
Total expenditure | £24 | £209 | £964 | £1.66k | £929 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO RELIEVE, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, PERSONS RESIDENT IN SMARDEN WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
SMARDEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 VESPER COTTAGES
CAGE LANE
SMARDEN
ASHFORD
TN27 8QD
- Phone:
- 01233771947
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window