Trustees INTERNATIONAL P.E.N.
Charity Number: 1117088

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arne Svingen | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kimberley Ann Echlin | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ege Dundar | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elisha July | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Lamwaka | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Tuma | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Salil Tripathi | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jose Gabriel Seisdedos | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eric Lax | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Burhan Sonmez | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.