FRIENDS OF GAYLE MILL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the operation of Gayle Mill, as requested by Gayle MIll Trust, the operators of the mill. It raises funds for the purchase of special items, provides volunteer support, and is currently working on Information leaflets and a book about Gayle Mill.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 12 January 2007: Standard registration
- 07 November 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.60k | £3.33k | £2.41k | £1.87k | £1.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.14k | £2.18k | £3.77k | £2.48k | £2.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 22 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 27 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 24 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 07 February 2017 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
ADVANCE THE PROMOTION, APPRECIATION, SUPPORT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GAYLE MILL THROUGH THE ACTIVITY OF A GROUP OF FRIENDS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NORTH YORKSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window