GODLY PLAY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Godly Play UK is a Christian movement centred on childhood spirituality, providing training, advice and support for those who use the Godly Play method to transform thinking and practice for the whole of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Elizabeth Ambrose | Chair | 07 October 2015 | ||||||
Rev Alison Barbara Shaw | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Jane Moger | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Charles Rogers | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Linda Parry | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Privett | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY ADA HAWES | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr ANNE RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.16k | £8.39k | £26.50k | £33.67k | £32.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.77k | £9.44k | £22.81k | £34.43k | £28.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25/09/06
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY MEANS OF A METHOD OF CHRISTIAN EDUCATION AND SPIRITUAL DIRECTION USING RELIGIOUS LANGUAGE AND SYMBOL TO HELP PEOPLE BECOME MORE AWARE OF THE MYSTERY OF GOD'S PRESENCE IN THEIR LIVES IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
229 ARBURY ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 2JJ
- Phone:
- 01223858994
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window