ORGANIZATION FOR BETTER ENVIRONMENT AND CHILDCARE (OBECC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Charity organisation is established for the purpose of preserving and protecting good health; Promoting good parenthood; ensuring a stable life styles amongst children and young people, elderly and others facing the threats of poverty or economic hardship; the advancement of education of children and the provision of necessary facilities for the daily care and recreation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Nigeria
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 08 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr KWASI OWUSU | Chair | 27 February 2012 |
|
|||||
Rev Isaac Benjamin Tay | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Anne W Owusu | Trustee | 27 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
RONALD M SEKIWANO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2019 | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.50k | £8.12k | £5.00k | £1.25k | £1.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.00k | £8.02k | £4.82k | £1.20k | £1.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 AUGUST 2006 AS AMENDED 16 DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
1) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF CLEAN WATER AND INFORMATION AND ADVICE ON HEALTH, HYGIENE, SANITATION AND OTHER RELEVANT ISSUES; 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST CHILDREN INCLUDING ORPHANS AND THEIR CARERS AND THE DISABLED; 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, INCLUDING THE SUPPORT OF SCHOOLS AND THE PROVISION OF THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Mandarin Way
Alvaston
DERBY
DE24 8YE
- Phone:
- 07931949261
- Email:
- obeccinfo@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window