ENERGY 4 IMPACT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a UK based NGO, established to promote social and economic development in rural and peri-urban areas of developing countries through access to appropriate modern energy services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

30 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kenya
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 11 May 2007: Standard registration
- GVEP INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Charles Marsh | Chair | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Angulo | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sean Alex Granville-Ross | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Oliver Nicholson | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richenda Van Leeuwen | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.03m | £4.85m | £4.06m | £3.85m | £975.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.84m | £4.55m | £3.67m | £4.64m | £1.81m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.99m | £922.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £20.98k | £15.37k | £72.59k | £26.84k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.00m | £4.82m | £3.99m | £3.83m | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £238 | £526 | £25 | £349 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £5.92k | £8.09k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.72m | £4.49m | £3.63m | £4.60m | £1.81m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £120.46k | £60.41k | £39.60k | £40.39k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £80.08k | £72.79k | £0 | £0 | £1.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £3.10m | £439.85k | £0 | £0 | £743.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £1.71k | £1.09k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.20m | £2.72m | £3.01m | £1.92m | £991.96k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £492.57k | £717.42k | £616.39k | £316.93k | £222.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | |||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | |||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 31 JULY 2006, 30 APRIL 2007, 7 JULY 2008 AND 18 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29 JUN 2016 as amended on 22 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; 3.2 TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY; (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF, AND IMPROVING ACCESS TO, ALTERNATIVE SOURCES OF ENERGY; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
R S M UK RESTRUCTURING ADVISORY LLP
25 FARRINGDON STREET
LONDON
EC4A 4AB
- Phone:
- 02032018836
- Email:
- LIZZIE.POPE@RSMUK.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window