Governing document ENERGY 4 IMPACT

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 31 JULY 2006, 30 APRIL 2007, 7 JULY 2008 AND 18 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29 JUN 2016 as amended on 22 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; 3.2 TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY; (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF, AND IMPROVING ACCESS TO, ALTERNATIVE SOURCES OF ENERGY; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.