Financial history ACES WHEELCHAIR BASKETBALL CLUB

Charity Number: 1122782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £12.22k £3.99k £19.60k £17.00k £21.73k
Total expenditure £13.46k £2.73k £13.83k £15.72k £22.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A