ACES WHEELCHAIR BASKETBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wheelchair Basketball Club incorporating teams catering for differing ages and standards
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 13 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY STRANGE | Chair | 16 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALWENA JAYNE APPLETON | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BEAUMONT | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.22k | £3.99k | £19.60k | £17.00k | £21.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.46k | £2.73k | £13.83k | £15.72k | £22.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION (ADOPTED) 17 DECEMBER 2006 as amended on 14 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISABLED CHILDREN AND ADULTS RESIDENT IN BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, INCLUDING AYLESBURY VALE, MILTON KEYNES AND STOKE MANDEVILLE, BY BRINGING THEM INTO CONTACT WITH THE SPORT OF WHEELCHAIR BASKETBALL AND OTHER SPORTS AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Boswick Lane
Dudswell
Berkhamsted
HP4 3TE
- Phone:
- 01442879565
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window