Accounts and annual returns EMMANUEL GLOBAL NETWORK (UK) LTD

Charity Number: 1116872
Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 March 2024 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 November 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 November 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window