Financial history EMMANUEL GLOBAL NETWORK (UK) LTD

Charity number: 1116872
Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £35.00k £35.00k £20.00k £19.50k £25.00k
Total expenditure £33.84k £41.80k £56.22k £47.82k £30.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A