YOUTH ACTION & DIVERSITY TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary objective is to meet the physical and mental needs of children and young people and their families through the provision of a wide range of activities and structures for supporting young people and to promote the development of new and innovative programs that will further educate and enhance the lives of children and young people and improve their quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £60,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Kent
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE THORNTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DAWN WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £270.52k | £242.60k | £270.97k | £288.83k | £298.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £278.55k | £196.70k | £263.00k | £302.47k | £300.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £60.00k | £60.00k | £60.00k | £60.00k | £60.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 AUGUST 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 DECEMBER 2006. null
Charitable objects
A) TO MEET THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A WIDE RANGE OF ACTIVITIES AND STRUCTURES FOR SUPPORTING YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF NEW AND INNOVATIVE PROGRAMMES THAT WILL FURTHER EDUCATE AND ENHANCE THE LIVES OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUTH PROFESSIONALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE GREENWICH, BEXLEY, DARTFORD, LEWISHAM, LONDON AND KENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Cray Neighbourhood Centre
1 Davis Way
Sidcup
DA14 5JR
- Phone:
- 02083028475
- Email:
- yadt@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window