THE SALLY POTTS ATAXIA TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 December 2006: Standard registration
- 11 February 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONGST PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ATAXIA; 2) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF ATAXIA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT ATAXIA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window