Financial history ORWELL MENCAP

Charity Number: 1117888
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.47m £1.47m £1.53m £1.70m £2.02m
Total expenditure £1.52m £1.34m £1.56m £1.79m £2.18m
Income from government contracts £738.78k £447.68k £903.02k £1.03m £1.31m
Income from government grants £56.90k £664.72k £159.75k £59.75k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £68.41k £678.05k £213.43k £129.01k £190.00k
Income - Other trading activities £1.26k £85 £282 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.40m £792.06k £1.31m £1.57m £1.82m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.59k £1.08k £585 £1.62k £10.01k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £17 £1
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.49m £1.31m £1.52m £1.75m £2.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £31.11k £31.99k £37.92k £39.17k £50.84k
Expenditure - Governance £45.48k £45.48k £41.63k £47.37k £39.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0