Trustees ORWELL MENCAP
Charity number: 1117888

Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Knell | Chair | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
maxine Smith | Trustee | 24 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Sybil Chesworth | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Simon Girling | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Scrogie | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Sophie Franks | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Dickson | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STEVENS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.