WREXHAM (PORTUGESE) CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The practice and advancement of Christianity founded on the Holy Bible. The Congregation holds regular twice-weekly meetings for the public worship of God and bible study. Further most congregation members have assisted by sharing regularly in preaching the good news of God's kingdom by Jesus Christ at every appropriate opportunity, and throughout the congregation area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wrexham
Governance
- 21 November 2006: Standard registration
- 04 March 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 04 March 2022: Funds transferred to 275946 THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.36k | £2.33k | £2.13k | £2.27k | £2.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.19k | £1.92k | £1.86k | £2.61k | £2.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 28 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07/10/06
Charitable objects
THE PRACTICE AND ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY FOUNDED ON THE HOLY BIBLE, INCLUDING THE PREACHING OF THE GOOD NEWS OF GOD'S KINGDOM BY JESUS CHRIST WITHIN THE CONGREGATION AREA AND THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS FOR PUBLIC CHRISTIAN WORSHIP
Area of benefit
CLWYD,CHESHIRE,SHROPSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window