HEAGE WINDMILLERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserving and promoting traditional dance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 17 May 2007: Standard registration
- 11 October 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.79k | £2.46k | £1.07k | £1.01k | £5 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.22k | £2.68k | £630 | £2.17k | £815 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 04 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 31 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 29 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 29 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED 22 DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR CLOG DANCING, STEP DANCING, MUSIC HALL AND STREET THEATRE BY THE HOLDING OF WORKSHOPS AND DEMONSTRATIONS AND BY ENCOURAGING YOUNG PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE IN THE SAID ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window