WORLD CAREGIVERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity was established to help aleviate child poverty in all areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 November 2006: Standard registration
- 23 August 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.68k | £1.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.21k | £1.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 24 November 2011 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | 28 June 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 24 November 2011 | 482 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | 08 April 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND TO MAKE DONATIONS OR GRANTS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS. (B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE SOCIAL, POLITICAL, ECONOMIC AND OTHER PROBLEMS THAT CONFRONT DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE; (C) TO PROVIDE HUMANITARIAN AND OTHER ESSENTIAL AID TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING THE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR MEDICAL AND OTHER SIMILAR AIDE TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING SICKNESS; AND (D) TO ACHIEVE AND PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY PROVIDING TEACHING AND TRAINING TO INDIVIDUALS IN CHRISTIAN BELIEFS.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window