GOD UNLIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
God Unlimited (Gul) runs an outdoor therapy centre that provides a range of activities for people of all ages, including people of all faiths and none. Gul provides for people with physical, mental and social challenges and for the general public. Gul has facilities, resources and trained staff with appropriate qualifications, and is supported by volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Carmarthenshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 22 November 2006: Standard registration
- 16 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.27k | £148.97k | £167.95k | £147.13k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.40k | £147.92k | £148.72k | £150.76k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 18 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | 21 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | 21 June 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | 03 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | 03 August 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTIONS THROUGH A NETWORK OF HEALTHY COMMUNITY AND THERAPY CENTRES FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH PROVISION BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, ILL-HEALTH OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WILTSHIRE AND CARMARTHENSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window