BLITHFIELD WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly Meetings, Group Meetings, Recreational meetings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 22 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET JAMES | Chair | 12 July 2011 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ANNE PICKERING | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
EDNA MEDDINGS | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY HUSSELBEE | Trustee | 13 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA MARTIN | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ALICE COOPER | Trustee | 01 January 1986 |
|
|
||||
MARY LANG FORREST SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTEL ROSEMARIE WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY ANNE CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.23k | £928 | £191 | £196 | £225 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.30k | £703 | £818 | £726 | £672 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2024 | 271 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 FEBRUARY 1925
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, ADMASTON STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE NURSERY FARM
HEATLEY
ABBOTS BROMLEY
RUGELEY
WS15 3EN
- Phone:
- 01283840635
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window