WIDCOMBE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
See Trustees' Report
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
125 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 April 2007: Standard registration
- 19 February 2019: Funds received from 241935 WIDCOMBE BAPTIST CHURCH
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSS LEVICK EVANS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sebastian Marc Walker | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel William Vaux Halliday | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Ellen Thomas | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Heasman | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Thomas Pollard | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Willoughby | Trustee | 15 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Peter Hope Hutchison | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Warren Battle | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CAMERON BARNETT | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR CLOVER TODMAN | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROGER HENWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £544.63k | £544.63k | £726.66k | £435.60k | £460.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £379.54k | £424.17k | £395.29k | £422.80k | £466.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £36.15k | N/A | £4.30k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £504.62k | £638.25k | £698.92k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £18.36k | £13.85k | £10.64k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £21.65k | £20.04k | £17.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £37.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £374.22k | £418.63k | £379.69k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.33k | £5.54k | £15.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.28k | £1.83k | £2.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £47.40k | £85.04k | £45.57k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £5.33k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 OCTOBER 2006. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 APR 2017
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE:- 3.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COVENANT OF MEMBERSHIP, DECLARATION OF FAITH AND CHURCH RULES AS SET OUT IN THE CHURCH MEMBERS' HANDBOOK. IN BATH AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY. 3.2 TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN BATH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 3.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN BATH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT ("THE OBJECTS").
Area of benefit
IN BATH, AND OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WIDCOMBE BAPTIST CHURCH
EBENEZER TERRACE
BATH
BA2 4JR
- Phone:
- 01225 316358
- Email:
- office@widcombe.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window